NE LB808 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB808 amended into LB907 by AM2376
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Change provisions of the Legal Education for Public Service Loan Repayment Act and transfer funds from the State Settlement Cash Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change provisions of the Legal Education for Public Service Loan Repayment Act and transfer funds from the State Settlement Cash Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB808 amended into LB907 by AM2376
2014-04-17LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2014-02-13LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 21, 2014
2014-01-13LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2014-01-10LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback