NE LB81 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-09 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-09 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the application fee for handgun certificates
Title
Change the application fee for handgun certificates
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Blood [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Larson MO158 prevailed |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Larson MO158 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Wayne AM1520 adopted |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Wayne AM1520 filed |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Chambers MO157 withdrawn |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Chambers MO157 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Erdman FA84 lost |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Erdman FA84 pending |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Erdman FA84 filed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2017-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-01-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 02, 2017 |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31462 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB81.pdf |