NE LB841 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to maximum annual benefits and disqualification for benefits under the Employment Security Law
Title
Change provisions relating to maximum annual benefits and disqualification for benefits under the Employment Security Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2016-03-07 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2016-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2016 |
2016-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2016-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=28489 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB841.pdf |