NE LB85 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a rental housing inspection program for a city of the metropolitan class or a city of the primary class
Title
Provide for a rental housing inspection program for a city of the metropolitan class or a city of the primary class
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover bill |
2019-04-17 | Legislature | Wayne AM1377 filed |
2019-02-01 | Legislature | Wayne AM117 filed |
2019-01-31 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM66 filed |
2019-01-31 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM66 |
2019-01-25 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2019-01-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=36988 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB85.pdf |