NE LB879 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminate funding for the Nebraska Advantage Microenterprise Tax Credit Act and change the termination date for applications
Title
Eliminate funding for the Nebraska Advantage Microenterprise Tax Credit Act and change the termination date for applications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-03-11 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Albrecht name added |
2020-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2020 |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2020-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=41185 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB879.pdf |