NE LB88 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB88 amended into LB86 by AM1199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-31 - Provisions/portions of LB88 amended into LB86 by AM1199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide an income tax credit for certain purchases of a residence
Title
Provide an income tax credit for certain purchases of a residence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB88 amended into LB86 by AM1199 |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2019-05-31 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone prevailed |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Motion to suspend rules to indefinitely postpone filed |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Revenue AM791 filed |
2019-03-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM791 |
2019-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2019 |
2019-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2019-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=37458 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB88.pdf |