NE LB909 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1136 amended into LB909 by AM2284
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1136 amended into LB909 by AM2284
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to motor carriers, hazardous materials regulations, and titling, registration, sales, and operation of motorboats and motor vehicles
Title
Change provisions relating to motor carriers, hazardous materials regulations, and titling, registration, sales, and operation of motorboats and motor vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-06 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1136 amended into LB909 by AM2284 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1092 amended into LB909 by AM2284 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1049 amended into LB909 by AM2284 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1011 amended into LB909 by AM2687 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB980 amended into LB909 by AM2647 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB900 amended into LB909 by AM2647 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB896 amended into LB909 by AM2284 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB895 amended into LB909 by AM2284 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB860 amended into LB909 by AM2647 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB740 amended into LB909 by AM2284 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 06, 2018 |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 46-0-3 |
2018-04-06 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST54 |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Harr AM2687 adopted |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Friesen AM2647 adopted |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Harr AM2546 withdrawn |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER145 adopted |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Brewer name added |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Harr AM2687 filed |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Friesen AM2647 filed |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER145 filed |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER145 |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Harr AM2546 filed |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-22 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM2284 adopted |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM2284 filed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2284 |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications priority bill |
2018-01-19 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 30, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |