NE LB946 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1084 amended into LB946 by AM2047
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1084 amended into LB946 by AM2047
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to bond elections, county surveyor elections, school board elections, administration and conduct of elections, vacancies, presidential electors, and threshold amounts under the Nebraska Political Accountability and Disclosure Act
Title
Change provisions relating to bond elections, county surveyor elections, school board elections, administration and conduct of elections, vacancies, presidential electors, and threshold amounts under the Nebraska Political Accountability and Disclosure Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1084 amended into LB946 by AM2047 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB833 amended into LB946 by AM2047 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB743 amended into LB946 by AM2047 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB726 amended into LB946 by AM2047 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB219 amended into LB946 by AM2121 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB167 amended into LB946 by AM2120 |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 02, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 43-0-6 |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2014-03-24 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST66 |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Scheer AM2448 adopted |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Scheer AM2448 filed |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Harr AM2548 adopted |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Harr AM2548 filed |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Karpisek AM2517 withdrawn |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh FA267 withdrawn |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Harr AM2502 withdrawn |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER179 adopted |
2014-03-19 | Legislature | Karpisek AM2517 filed |
2014-03-19 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh FA267 filed |
2014-03-19 | Legislature | Harr AM2502 filed |
2014-03-18 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER179 filed |
2014-03-18 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER179 |
2014-03-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-13 | Legislature | Dubas AM2204 adopted |
2014-03-13 | Legislature | Murante AM2120 adopted |
2014-03-13 | Legislature | Avery AM2121 adopted |
2014-03-13 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2047 adopted |
2014-03-07 | Legislature | Dubas AM2204 filed |
2014-03-06 | Legislature | Murante AM2120 filed |
2014-03-06 | Legislature | Avery AM2121 filed |
2014-02-25 | Legislature | Government, Military and Veterans Affairs AM2047 filed |
2014-02-25 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2047 |
2014-02-20 | Legislature | Murante priority bill |
2014-01-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2014 |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2014-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |