NE LB961 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB951 amended into LB961 by AM2626
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB951 amended into LB961 by AM2626
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for a fire fighting compact, change workers' compensation provisions and require coverage for volunteer firefighters, change provisions of the Nebraska Hospital-Medical Liability Act, the Nebraska Construction Prompt Pay Act, and the Employment Security Law
Title
Provide for a fire fighting compact, change workers' compensation provisions and require coverage for volunteer firefighters, change provisions of the Nebraska Hospital-Medical Liability Act, the Nebraska Construction Prompt Pay Act, and the Employment Security Law
Sponsors
Sen. Tanya Cook [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB951 amended into LB961 by AM2626 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB895 amended into LB961 by AM2626 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB893 amended into LB961 by AM2685 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB820 amended into LB961 by AM2626 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB559A amended into LB961 by AM2895 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB559 amended into LB961 by AM2895 |
2014-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB373 amended into LB961 by AM2895 |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 16, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 10, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 47-0-2 |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST87 |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Mello AM2895 adopted |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Mello AM2895 filed |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Chambers AM2828 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Lathrop AM2685 adopted |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER232 adopted |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Chambers AM2828 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Lathrop AM2685 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER232 filed |
2014-04-02 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER232 |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Lathrop AM2692 adopted |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Lathrop AM2692 filed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM2626 adopted |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Business and Labor AM2626 filed |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2626 |
2014-02-20 | Legislature | Business and Labor priority bill |
2014-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2014 |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2014-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |