NE LB962 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-27 - Approved by Governor on July 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-27 - Approved by Governor on July 24, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Nebraska Fair Pay to Play Act
Title
Adopt the Nebraska Fair Pay to Play Act
Sponsors
Sen. Megan Hunt [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 37-6-6 (Y: 37 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Legislature - La Grone AM2605 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Legislature - Hansen, M. AM2580 adopted (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Legislature - La Grone AM2605 adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Legislature - Hansen, M. AM2580 adopted (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on July 24, 2020 |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Hilkemann explanation of vote |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on July 21, 2020 |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-07-21 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 37-6-6 |
2020-03-12 | Legislature | Chambers name added |
2020-03-11 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST50 |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-03-06 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER177 adopted |
2020-02-26 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER177 filed |
2020-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER177 |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | La Grone AM2605 adopted |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | La Grone AM2605 filed |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM2580 adopted |
2020-02-25 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM2541 withdrawn |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM2580 filed |
2020-02-20 | Legislature | Hansen, M. AM2541 filed |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Hunt priority bill |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-02-10 | Legislature | Quick name added |
2020-02-05 | Legislature | Kolowski name added |
2020-01-29 | Legislature | Howard name added |
2020-01-29 | Legislature | Cavanaugh name added |
2020-01-29 | Legislature | Stinner name added |
2020-01-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2020 |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Business and Labor Committee |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |