NE LB983 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB981 amended into LB983 by AM1820
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Change licensing provisions and operating restrictions for commercial motor vehicles, farm vehicles, and other vehicles as prescribed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Change licensing provisions and operating restrictions for commercial motor vehicles, farm vehicles, and other vehicles as prescribed

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB981 amended into LB983 by AM1820
2014-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB249 amended into LB983 by AM1820
2014-03-31LegislatureApproved by Governor on March 28, 2014
2014-03-24LegislaturePresented to Governor on March 24, 2014
2014-03-24LegislaturePresident/Speaker signed
2014-03-24LegislaturePassed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 42-0-7
2014-03-24LegislatureDispensing of reading at large approved
2014-03-10LegislaturePlaced on Final Reading with ST46
2014-03-05LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment
2014-03-05LegislatureDubas AM1984 adopted
2014-03-05LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER139 adopted
2014-02-26LegislatureDubas AM1984 filed
2014-02-25LegislatureEnrollment and Review ER139 filed
2014-02-25LegislaturePlaced on Select File with ER139
2014-02-20LegislatureAdvanced to Enrollment and Review Initial
2014-02-20LegislatureTransportation and Telecommunications AM1820 adopted
2014-02-12LegislatureTransportation and Telecommunications priority bill
2014-02-12LegislatureTransportation and Telecommunications AM1820 filed
2014-02-12LegislaturePlaced on General File with AM1820
2014-01-27LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 03, 2014
2014-01-22LegislatureReferred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
2014-01-17LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback