NE LB986 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Neighborhood Improvement District Act and change provisions relating to special assessments for other improvement or development districts as prescribed
Title
Adopt the Neighborhood Improvement District Act and change provisions relating to special assessments for other improvement or development districts as prescribed
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Hansen AM2072 filed |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Larson MO281 prevailed |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Larson MO281 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Larson MO280 not approved |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Larson MO280 Unanimous consent to bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM1958 pending |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM1958 filed |
2018-02-26 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1958 |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Hansen priority bill |
2018-01-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 06, 2018 |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2018-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34248 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB986.pdf |