NE LB988 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB988 amended into LB788 by AM2930
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provide for certain access to decedent's safe deposit box

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide for certain access to decedent's safe deposit box

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-23LegislatureProvisions/portions of LB988 amended into LB788 by AM2930
2014-04-17LegislatureIndefinitely postponed
2014-02-12LegislatureNotice of hearing for February 19, 2014
2014-01-23LegislatureReferred to Judiciary Committee
2014-01-21LegislatureDate of introduction

Nebraska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback