NE LR144 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Notice of hearing for September 13, 2019
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-13 - Notice of hearing for September 13, 2019
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the effectiveness of cash bail and cash bonds for misdemeanors and city and village ordinance violations
Title
Interim study to examine the effectiveness of cash bail and cash bonds for misdemeanors and city and village ordinance violations
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 13, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2019-05-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40051 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR144.pdf |