NE LR1CA | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to require voter identification
Title
Constitutional amendment to require voter identification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Murante MO325 failed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Murante MO325 Invoke cloture filed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Murante MO326 withdrawn |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Murante MO326 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-04-05 | Legislature | Morfeld MO317 pending |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA145 filed |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Chambers FA144 filed |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2815 filed |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Morfeld AM2805 filed |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Morfeld MO317 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed |
2018-02-20 | Legislature | Larson priority resolution |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Murante MO128 failed |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Murante MO128 Invoke cloture filed |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Wayne MO10 failed |
2017-04-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2017-04-20 | Legislature | Wayne FA65 filed |
2017-04-20 | Legislature | Wayne MO92 Recommit to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee filed |
2017-04-20 | Legislature | Wayne MO91 Bracket until June 2, 2017 filed |
2017-03-09 | Legislature | Murante priority resolution |
2017-02-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 02, 2017 |
2017-01-13 | Legislature | Wayne MO10 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Section 3(f) filed |
2017-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-01-05 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=31414 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR1CA.pdf |