NE LR212 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-01 - Notice of hearing for October 04, 2019
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-01 - Notice of hearing for October 04, 2019
Pending: Legislature Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to assess the financial position of the Nebraska Brand Committee and to identify core operational needs and opportunities for efficiency improvement
Title
Interim study to assess the financial position of the Nebraska Brand Committee and to identify core operational needs and opportunities for efficiency improvement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 04, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40360 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR212.pdf |