NE LR217 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Notice of hearing for October 18, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-10 - Notice of hearing for October 18, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the feasibility of developing a process for the preparation and consideration of racial impact statements on legislation
Title
Interim study to examine the feasibility of developing a process for the preparation and consideration of racial impact statements on legislation
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Vargas [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 18, 2019 |
2019-06-05 | Legislature | Communication |
2019-05-24 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2019-05-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40519 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR217.pdf |