NE LR29CA | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to change provisions relating to redevelopment projects
Title
Constitutional amendment to change provisions relating to redevelopment projects
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Adams [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-17 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER117 filed |
2014-01-17 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER117 |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO107 withdrawn |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Chambers MO107 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Schumacher FA160 withdrawn |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Schumacher FA160 filed |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM273 adopted |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM273 pending |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution. |
2013-03-14 | Legislature | Urban Affairs priority resolution |
2013-02-19 | Legislature | Urban Affairs AM273 filed |
2013-02-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM273 |
2013-02-08 | Legislature | Johnson name added |
2013-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 12, 2013 |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2013-01-18 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=18424 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR29CA.pdf |