NE LR370 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - Notice of hearing for September 07, 2018
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - Notice of hearing for September 07, 2018
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to conduct a review of issues arising from the lack of mental health treatment for those in the criminal justice system
Title
Interim study to conduct a review of issues arising from the lack of mental health treatment for those in the criminal justice system
Sponsors
Sen. Matt Hansen [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 07, 2018 |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2018-03-26 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=36165 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR370.pdf |