NE LR393CA | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to change signature requirements for initiative petitions
Title
Constitutional amendment to change signature requirements for initiative petitions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2014 |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Garrett name added |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Schumacher name added |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Scheer name added |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh name added |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Dubas name added |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Bloomfield name added |
2014-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2014-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21417 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR393CA.pdf |