NE LR397 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-05 - Notice of hearing for August 28, 2018
Pending: Legislature Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-05 - Notice of hearing for August 28, 2018
Pending: Legislature Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the statutory authority for municipalities to establish port authorities
Title
Interim study to examine the statutory authority for municipalities to establish port authorities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for August 28, 2018 |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=36256 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR397.pdf |