NE LR399 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recommend the enactment of comprehensive immigration reform
Title
Recommend the enactment of comprehensive immigration reform
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Brasch explanation of vote |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Cook name added |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Adopted |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | McCoy AM2939 withdrawn |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | McCoy AM2939 filed |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | McCoy MO196 failed |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | McCoy MO196 Recommit to the Judiciary Committee filed |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Smith MO193 withdrawn |
2014-04-09 | Legislature | Smith MO193 Bracket until April 17, 2014 filed |
2014-02-25 | Legislature | Karpisek name withdrawn |
2014-02-24 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration |
2014-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2014 |
2014-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Laid over |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21962 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR399.pdf |