NE LR400 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Report
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Report
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide the Executive Board of the Legislative Council appoint a special committee to be known as the ACCESSNebraska Special Investigative Committee of the Legislature
Title
Provide the Executive Board of the Legislative Council appoint a special committee to be known as the ACCESSNebraska Special Investigative Committee of the Legislature
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Report |
2014-03-26 | Legislature | Report |
2014-03-10 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-03-07 | Legislature | Adopted |
2014-02-11 | Legislature | Davis name added |
2014-02-11 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration |
2014-01-28 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 10, 2014 |
2014-01-15 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Laid over |
2014-01-14 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21996 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR400.pdf |