NE LR402 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-06 - Notice of hearing for October 27, 2020
Pending: Legislature Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-06 - Notice of hearing for October 27, 2020
Pending: Legislature Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the impact of COVID-19 on the education of Nebraska's children
Title
Interim study to examine the impact of COVID-19 on the education of Nebraska's children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-06 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 27, 2020 |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=42841 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR402.pdf |