NE LR411CA | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize municipalities and counties to exercise powers in matters of local concern and to eliminate home rule charters
Title
Authorize municipalities and counties to exercise powers in matters of local concern and to eliminate home rule charters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-02-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2014 |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2014-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=21842 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR411CA.pdf |