NE LR414 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Request the federal government to reject changes to the current law governing country of origin meat labeling
Title
Request the federal government to reject changes to the current law governing country of origin meat labeling
Sponsors
Sen. Al Davis [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-01-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 25, 2014 |
2014-01-23 | Legislature | Referred to Agriculture Committee |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Laid over |
2014-01-21 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=22214 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR414.pdf |