NE LR415 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-15 - Notice of hearing for November 10, 2020
Pending: Legislature Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-15 - Notice of hearing for November 10, 2020
Pending: Legislature Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the state inheritance tax, its current structure, and recommendations on whether it should be amended, replaced, or repealed
Title
Interim study to examine the state inheritance tax, its current structure, and recommendations on whether it should be amended, replaced, or repealed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for November 10, 2020 |
2020-07-30 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2020-07-27 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=43016 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LR415.pdf |