NE LR418 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - Notice of hearing for September 28, 2018
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-30 - Notice of hearing for September 28, 2018
Pending: Legislature Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the disproportionality that exists in Nebraska's foster care and juvenile justice systems
Title
Interim study to examine the disproportionality that exists in Nebraska's foster care and juvenile justice systems
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Howard [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 28, 2018 |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2018-03-27 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=36320 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR418.pdf |