NE LR41CA | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Presented to Secretary of State on April 07, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Presented to Secretary of State on April 07, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment authorizing legislation for licensing and regulating wagering on live or replayed horseraces
Title
Constitutional amendment authorizing legislation for licensing and regulating wagering on live or replayed horseraces
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Presented to Secretary of State on April 07, 2014 |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading for General Election 30-17-2 |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh MO177 prevailed |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh MO177 Reconsider the vote on final passage of the resolution filed |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Failed to pass on Final Reading for General Election 28-19-2 |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Karpisek FA316 withdrawn |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Karpisek FA316 filed |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File withdrawn |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | McCoy AM2378 withdrawn |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Chambers FA238 withdrawn |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Chambers FA237 withdrawn |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Chambers FA236 withdrawn |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Chambers FA235 withdrawn |
2014-04-03 | Legislature | Chambers FA234 withdrawn |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading Second with ST70 |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Reengrossment |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh AM1910 adopted |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Returned to Select File for specific amendment |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh MO154 prevailed |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh MO154 Invoke cloture filed |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh AM1788 withdrawn |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Chair ruled AM495 out of order |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh raised point of order on AM495 |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File pending |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | McCoy MO153 failed |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | McCoy MO153 Reconsider the vote taken to bracket until April 17, 2014 filed |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | McCoy MO152 failed |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | McCoy MO152 Bracket until April 17, 2014 filed |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | McCoy MO151 failed |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | McCoy MO151 Reconsider the vote taken to substitute AM2378 for AM495 filed |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | McCoy MO150 failed |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | McCoy MO150 Substitute AM2378 for AM495 filed |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh objected to unanimous consent request to substitute amendment |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | McCoy AM2378 filed |
2014-03-25 | Legislature | Motion to return to Select File pending |
2014-03-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST47 |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Karpisek name added |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Chambers FA238 filed |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Chambers FA237 filed |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Chambers FA236 filed |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Chambers FA235 filed |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Chambers FA234 filed |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh AM1910 filed |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh FA22 lost |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Chambers FA228 withdrawn |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Chambers FA228 filed |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Chambers FA21 withdrawn |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Chambers FA20 withdrawn |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Chambers FA19 withdrawn |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Chambers FA18 withdrawn |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Chambers FA17 withdrawn |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Chambers FA16 withdrawn |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | McCoy AM496 withdrawn |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | McCoy AM497 withdrawn |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | McCoy AM2215 lost |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | McCoy AM2215 pending |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | McCoy AM2215 pending |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | McCoy AM2215 filed |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | McCoy AM494 withdrawn |
2014-03-05 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER27 adopted |
2014-02-05 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh AM1788 filed |
2014-02-03 | Legislature | General Affairs priority resolution |
2014-01-08 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution. |
2013-03-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER27 filed |
2013-03-14 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER27 |
2013-03-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2013-03-13 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh AM581 adopted |
2013-03-13 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh MO25 prevailed |
2013-03-13 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh MO25 Invoke cloture filed |
2013-03-13 | Legislature | Chambers FA27 lost |
2013-03-13 | Legislature | Chambers FA27 filed |
2013-03-13 | Legislature | Chambers FA25 withdrawn |
2013-03-13 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh FA26 adopted |
2013-03-12 | Legislature | Chambers FA25 filed |
2013-03-12 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh FA26 pending |
2013-03-12 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh FA26 filed |
2013-03-12 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh FA24 withdrawn |
2013-03-12 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh FA24 filed |
2013-03-12 | Legislature | Karpisek FA23 withdrawn |
2013-03-12 | Legislature | Karpisek FA23 filed |
2013-03-12 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh AM581 pending |
2013-03-12 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh AM581 filed |
2013-03-12 | Legislature | McCoy MO19 failed |
2013-03-07 | Legislature | Lautenbaugh FA22 filed |
2013-03-07 | Legislature | McCoy AM495 filed |
2013-03-07 | Legislature | McCoy AM496 filed |
2013-03-07 | Legislature | McCoy AM497 filed |
2013-03-07 | Legislature | Chambers MO23 failed |
2013-03-07 | Legislature | Chambers MO23 pending |
2013-03-07 | Legislature | Chambers MO23 Bracket until May 30, 2013 filed |
2013-03-07 | Legislature | McCoy MO19 pending |
2013-03-06 | Legislature | Chambers FA21 filed |
2013-03-06 | Legislature | Chambers FA20 filed |
2013-03-06 | Legislature | Chambers FA19 filed |
2013-03-06 | Legislature | Chambers FA18 filed |
2013-03-06 | Legislature | Chambers FA17 filed |
2013-03-06 | Legislature | Chambers FA16 filed |
2013-03-06 | Legislature | McCoy MO19 pending |
2013-03-06 | Legislature | McCoy AM494 filed |
2013-03-04 | Legislature | McCoy MO19 Recommit to the General Affairs Committee filed |
2013-02-14 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2013-02-04 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 11, 2013 |
2013-01-24 | Legislature | Referred to General Affairs Committee |
2013-01-23 | Legislature | Date of introduction |