NE LR426 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-06 - Notice of hearing for August 27, 2010
Status: Introduced on March 24 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-06 - Notice of hearing for August 27, 2010
Summary
Interim study to examine the honeybee industry in Nebraska
Title
Interim study to examine the honeybee industry in Nebraska
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Notice of hearing for August 27, 2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Referred to Agriculture Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Referred to Executive Board | |
2010-03-24 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=11206 |