NE LR482 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-17 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urge the United States Environmental Protection Agency, in developing guidelines for regulating carbon dioxide emissions from existing power plants, to respect the primacy of Nebraska and other states and to rely on state regulators to develop performance standards
Title
Urge the United States Environmental Protection Agency, in developing guidelines for regulating carbon dioxide emissions from existing power plants, to respect the primacy of Nebraska and other states and to rely on state regulators to develop performance standards
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Carlson [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Adopted |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Haar FA333 withdrawn |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Haar FA332 withdrawn |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Haar FA331 withdrawn |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Haar FA330 withdrawn |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Haar FA329 withdrawn |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Haar FA328 withdrawn |
2014-04-10 | Legislature | Haar AM2900 withdrawn |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Haar FA333 filed |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Haar FA332 filed |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Haar FA331 filed |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Haar FA330 filed |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Haar FA329 filed |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Haar FA328 filed |
2014-04-08 | Legislature | Haar AM2900 filed |
2014-04-07 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Howard name added |
2014-03-27 | Legislature | Wallman name added |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for March 31, 2014 |
2014-03-13 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2014-03-12 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2014-03-12 | Legislature | Laid over |
2014-03-12 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=22740 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR482.pdf |