NE LR491 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-05 - Notice of hearing for October 29, 2010
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-05 - Notice of hearing for October 29, 2010
Summary
Interim study to examine requiring a boating education course in order to reduce the number of accidents
Title
Interim study to examine requiring a boating education course in order to reduce the number of accidents
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Schilz [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-05 | Notice of hearing for October 29, 2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Referred to Natural Resources Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Executive Board | |
2010-03-29 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=11331 |