NE LR496 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-04 - Notice of hearing for September 29, 2010
Status: Introduced on March 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-08-04 - Notice of hearing for September 29, 2010
Summary
Interim study to examine issues relating to state and local taxation of wind energy electrical generation facilities
Title
Interim study to examine issues relating to state and local taxation of wind energy electrical generation facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-04 | Notice of hearing for September 29, 2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Referred to Revenue Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Referred to Executive Board | |
2010-03-29 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=11302 |