NE LR512 | 2013-2014 | 103rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Encourage Nebraska high schools to offer hands-only CPR training
Title
Encourage Nebraska high schools to offer hands-only CPR training
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2014-03-31 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for April 07, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Laid over |
2014-03-20 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=23523 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR512.pdf |