NE LR519 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-07 - Notice of hearing for October 25, 2012
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-07 - Notice of hearing for October 25, 2012
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine wage subsidy programs
Title
Interim study to examine wage subsidy programs
Sponsors
Sen. Heath Mello [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-07 | Notice of hearing for October 25, 2012 | |
2012-03-30 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Referred to Executive Board | |
2012-03-21 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=17373 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR519.pdf |