NE LR578 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-03 - Notice of hearing for September 25, 2012
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-03 - Notice of hearing for September 25, 2012
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to assess the State of Nebraska's compliance with both the federal Indian Child Welfare Act of 1978 and the Nebraska Indian Child Welfare Act, and to make recommendations for improvements
Title
Interim study to assess the State of Nebraska's compliance with both the federal Indian Child Welfare Act of 1978 and the Nebraska Indian Child Welfare Act, and to make recommendations for improvements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-03 | Notice of hearing for September 25, 2012 | |
2012-03-30 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | |
2012-03-27 | Referred to Executive Board | |
2012-03-27 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=17483 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR578.pdf |