NE LR601 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Report
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Report
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Review present facilities and determine the needs and options for developing a regional certified crime laboratory in the Omaha area
Title
Review present facilities and determine the needs and options for developing a regional certified crime laboratory in the Omaha area
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Report |
2016-04-13 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Adopted |
2016-04-06 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration |
2016-03-31 | Legislature | Correction |
2016-03-30 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for April 06, 2016 |
2016-03-30 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2016-03-30 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2016-03-29 | Legislature | Laid over |
2016-03-29 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=30360 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR601.pdf |