NH CACR17 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 14-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-31 - Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 14-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to natural rights. Providing that discrimination based on sexual orientation is prohibited.
Title
Relating to natural rights. Providing that discrimination based on sexual orientation is prohibited.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - House - Interim Study (Y: 234 N: 95 NV: 25 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-31 | House | Interim Study Report: Not Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 14-3) |
2014-08-20 | House | Executive Session: 9/17/2014, Legislative Office Building 208, 1:30 PM |
2014-04-30 | House | Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 234-95 |
2014-04-24 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 32 |
2014-04-09 | House | =REVISED=Executive Session: 4/22/14 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-03-20 | House | Public Hearing: 4/2/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-03-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0988s, 3/5 necessary, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 7 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Sen. Kelly Floor Amendment #2014-0988s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Special Ordered to the call of the Chair, Without Objection, Motion Adopted |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/13/14; Senate Calendar 9 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | ===RESCHEDULED===Hearing: 3/4/14, Room 100, State House, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | ===CANCELLED===Hearing: 2/19/14, Room 103, State House, 11:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Rules, Enrolled Bills and Internal Affairs |