NH CACR19 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 217-112 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 217-112 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to right to govern. Providing that the people of the state may enact local laws that protect health, safety and welfare.
Title
Relating to right to govern. Providing that the people of the state may enact local laws that protect health, safety and welfare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - ITL (Y: 217 N: 112 NV: 20 Abs: 43) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 217-112 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 29 |
2018-03-07 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-07 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-02-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-02-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 62 |
2018-02-21 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 02/27/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-02-16 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/23/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-01-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/14/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-01-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-01-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-01-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-01-11 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 02/06/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 25 |