NH CACR6 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted DV 222-146 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted DV 222-146 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to elections. Providing that any inhabitant who so desires may vote by absentee ballot in primary and general elections.
Title
Relating to elections. Providing that any inhabitant who so desires may vote by absentee ballot in primary and general elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted DV 222-146 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 23 |
2019-03-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed DV 208-158 Lacking Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 22 |
2019-02-19 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-19 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/07/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 9 |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building308 |
2018-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 47 |