NH CACR9 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future CACR9
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to redistricting. Providing that an independent redistricting commission shall be established to draw boundaries for state and federal offices.
Title
Relating to redistricting. Providing that an independent redistricting commission shall be established to draw boundaries for state and federal offices.
Sponsors
Rep. David Doherty [D] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Rep. Marjorie Porter [D] | Rep. David Huot [D] |
Sen. Jeanne Dietsch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-11-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2742h (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) |
2019-10-04 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-08-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-02-20 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 16 |
Same As/Similar To
CACR9 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate