NH CACR9 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous CACR9
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Amendment # 2019-2742h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 93
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Amendment # 2019-2742h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 93
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to redistricting. Providing that an independent redistricting commission shall be established to draw boundaries for state and federal offices.
Title
Relating to redistricting. Providing that an independent redistricting commission shall be established to draw boundaries for state and federal offices.
Sponsors
Rep. David Doherty [D] | Rep. Marjorie Porter [D] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Rep. David Huot [D] |
Sen. Jeanne Dietsch [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 217 N: 150 NV: 11 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-2742h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 93 |
2020-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2742h: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 217-150 Lacking Necessary Three-Fifths Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 93 |
2019-11-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-11-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2742h (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 21 |
2019-10-04 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-08-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-02-20 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-10 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 16 |
Same As/Similar To
CACR9 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate