NH HB1101 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 345; I. Sec 1-2 eff 8/31/2018;II. Rem eff 07/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 345; I. Sec 1-2 eff 8/31/2018;II. Rem eff 07/02/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Regulating groundwater pollution caused by polluting emissions in the air and relative to standards for perfluorochemicals in drinking water, ambient groundwater and surface water.
Title
Regulating groundwater pollution caused by polluting emissions in the air and relative to standards for perfluorochemicals in drinking water, ambient groundwater and surface water.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/02/2018; Chapter 345; I. Sec 1-2 eff 8/31/2018;II. Rem eff 07/02/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2095e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2095e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1628s (Reps. Christensen, Barry): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19A |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1628s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1628s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1628s, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 04/03/2018, Room 103, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 102 |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 19-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 46 |
2018-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-02-14 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/20/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-02-14 | House | Public Hearing: 02/20/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-02-08 | House | Referred to Science, Technology and Energy 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 64 |
2018-02-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0334h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 64 |
2018-02-08 | House | Amendment # 2018-0334h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 61 |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0334h for 02/07/2018 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 25 |
2018-01-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/24/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-11-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 2 |