NH HB1103 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/26/2018; Chapter 338; Eff. 7/1/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/26/2018; Chapter 338; Eff. 7/1/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to financial responsibility for voluntary services provided pursuant to a report of abuse or neglect that is "unfounded but with reasonable concern."
Title
Relative to financial responsibility for voluntary services provided pursuant to a report of abuse or neglect that is "unfounded but with reasonable concern."
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Hinch [R] | Rep. Kimberly Rice [R] | Rep. Peter Spanos [R] | Rep. Skip Berrien [D] |
Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment 1916s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/26/2018; Chapter 338; Eff. 7/1/2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1794s (Rep. K. Rice): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2018-1916s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14, Amendment Failed; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19A |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1794s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2018-1794s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/27/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 4 |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 3 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 2 |