NH HB1111 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/22/2020; Chapter 28; I. Sec 1-3 Eff: 9/20/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 7/22/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/22/2020; Chapter 28; I. Sec 1-3 Eff: 9/20/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 7/22/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to municipal broadband infrastructure bonds and establishing communications districts.
Title
Relative to municipal broadband infrastructure bonds and establishing communications districts.
Sponsors
Rep. Jaci Grote [D] | Rep. Kate Murray [D] | Rep. Gerri Cannon [D] | Rep. Stephen Woodcock [D] |
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/22/2020; Chapter 28; I. Sec 1-3 Eff: 9/20/2020 II. Rem. Eff: 7/22/2020 |
2020-07-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-07-16 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 74 |
2020-07-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1628: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 71 |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1628e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-30 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Carson): Motion Adopted DV 248-64 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 57 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1479s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1479s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1479s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | The following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: 939 4171 9223 Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 5. Webinar ID: 939 4171 9223 Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13126266799,,93941719223# or 19292056099,,93941719223# Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 3. To listen via telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 5. Webinar ID: Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_UHPWI_mSR4q7lP_4RClwXA Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Members of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Committee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 06/11/2020, 01:05 pm, on proposed amendment # 2020-1339s; Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 06/11/2020, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/12/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1011h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2020-1011h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1011h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 24 |
2020-02-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/03/2020 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-02-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/25/2020 12:15 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-02-19 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2020 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-02-12 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/18/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-02-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 10 |