NH HB1112 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study programs for female parolees.
Title
Establishing a committee to study programs for female parolees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0270h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 2 |
2020-03-05 | House | Amendment # 2020-0270h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 2 |
2020-02-20 | House | Special Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Spillane) 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0270h (NT) for 02/19/2020 (Vote 19-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 3 |
2020-01-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/28/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 10 |