NH HB1115 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 282-6 03/12/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the discharge of a firearm in the compact part of a city or town.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the discharge of a firearm in the compact part of a city or town.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - ITL (Y: 282 N: 6 NV: 63 Abs: 45) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 282-6 03/12/2020
2020-03-04HouseMinority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study
2020-03-04HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 17-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 67
2020-02-12HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2020-02-12HousePublic Hearing: 02/18/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-12-02HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 10

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback