NH HB112 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 253; Eff: 09/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 253; Eff: 09/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the mechanical licensing board.
Title
Relative to the mechanical licensing board.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Peter Schmidt [D] | Rep. Steven Beaudoin [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 253; Eff: 09/17/2019 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1774s (Rep. Goley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 3 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1774s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1774s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1774s, 05/15/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Hearing: 05/01/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0058h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 10 |
2019-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2019-0058h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 10 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0058h for 02/14/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 5 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-12-26 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 38 |