NH HB1120 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the establishment of water testing requirements for residential rental property.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the establishment of water testing requirements for residential rental property.
Sponsors
Rep. Wendy Thomas [D] | Rep. Edith DesMarais [D] | Rep. Wendy Chase [D] | Rep. Sherry Frost [D] |
Rep. David Coursin [D] | Rep. Kathryn Stack [D] | Rep. Mary Eisner [D] | Rep. Charlotte DiLorenzo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0971h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 124 |
2020-03-12 | House | Amendment # 2020-0971h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 124 |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0971h (NT) for 03/11/2020 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 60 |
2020-02-19 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/03/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2020-01-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2020-01-15 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 01/30/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2020-01-08 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/14/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 10 |