NH HB1128 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adding deaf or hard of hearing to the medical conditions that may be indicated on a driver's license or nondriver's identification.
Title
Adding deaf or hard of hearing to the medical conditions that may be indicated on a driver's license or nondriver's identification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 23 |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/19/2020 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 15 |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 10 |